U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 25, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 25, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
January, 2025
  • January 20, 2025: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • June 28, 2022: [Travel]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • May 06, 2022: [Travel]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.