U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00403-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Banuelos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • May 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • February 16, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 10, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 02, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.