U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00512-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aceituno
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order for Exam]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • May 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 06, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 02, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.