U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cr-00239-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rios-Mimbela
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 31, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 30, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.