U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez-Magallanes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • May 05, 2022: [Review of Detention]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 19, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • April 18, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 18, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.