U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Widmar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [RISE Program Referral Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • July 05, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [Discovery]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.