U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00142-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moye
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 21, 2022: [Furlough]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 13, 2022: [Exclude]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 26, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 26, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.