U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00179-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flickinger
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
  • December 06, 2022: [Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • May 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.