U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00188-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2025
  • February 10, 2025: [Petition and Order]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 30, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 10, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 08, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 08, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 07, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.