U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00166-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reynolds
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 16, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 10, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 10, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 10, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 10, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 10, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 09, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.