U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00210-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Egli
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Continue]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 07, 2024: [Trial Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 27, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reassign Case]
  • July 19, 2022: [Reassign Case]
  • July 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 21, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 20, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.