U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00262-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ibarra
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order for Exam]
  • November 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 04, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Discovery]
  • August 03, 2022: [Detention]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.