U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hughes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Review of Detention]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 15, 2022: [Detention]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.