U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Billie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Amended Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 30, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 29, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.