U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00303-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mata
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 11, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • October 19, 2022: [Review of Detention]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 01, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Detention]
  • August 31, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.