U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00329-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramirez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 08, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 13, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • September 12, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.