U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00339-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gutierrez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 17, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 03, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • October 03, 2022: [Discovery]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Detention]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 19, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.