U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McCray
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • November 08, 2022: [Review of Detention]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 06, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Detention]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.