U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00361-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lambson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 15, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 18, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 18, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 13, 2022: [Detention]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 12, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.