U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00390-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hagans
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 23, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 08, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 08, 2022: [Discovery]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 05, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.