U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00388-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez-Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 31, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 31, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 27, 2022: [Detention]
  • October 26, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.