U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bojorquez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Joinder]
  • December 23, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 07, 2022: [Discovery]
  • November 07, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 04, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.