U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00482-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gardner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order for Exam]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 19, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 17, 2025: [Trial Order]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 14, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 14, 2022: [Discovery]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Detention]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.