U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00491-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Noble et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 16, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 08, 2025: [U-ACT Ineligible Participant Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • January 18, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • January 12, 2023: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.