U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00755
  • Case Name: Jonsson et al v. Office of Administrative Hearings et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 18, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 11, 2025: [Short Form Discovery]
  • April 11, 2025: [Expedite]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.