U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00225
  • Case Name: Abelia Limited v. TVPX Aircraft Solutions
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 24, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 23, 2025: [Intervene]
  • April 22, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 16, 2025: [Respond]
  • April 08, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order to Propose Schedule]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order of Recusal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.