U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00031
  • Case Name: I-81, LLC v. FELHER TRANSPORTATION, INC., et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Reply]
  • April 24, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 18, 2025: [Reply]
  • April 17, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • April 17, 2025: [State Court Records]
  • April 15, 2025: [State Court Records]
  • April 07, 2025: [Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Requirement - Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Requesting State Court Record]
  • April 04, 2025: [E-Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.