Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:15-81685-13
    Party Name:JesHenry F. Malone
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hatcher, Michele T. [Approving]
    Date Published:April 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hatcher, Michele T. [Notice of Hearing - Van002]
    Date Published:March 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hatcher, Michele T. [Exhibit]
    Date Published:March 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hatcher, Michele T. [Approve Loan Modification]
    Date Published:March 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hatcher, Michele T. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:March 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hatcher, Michele T. [Reducing Notice Time and Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:March 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hatcher, Michele T. [Fact Summary for Motion for Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:March 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hatcher, Michele T. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:March 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hatcher, Michele T. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:March 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hatcher, Michele T. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
    Date Published:February 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hatcher, Michele T. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:November 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hatcher, Michele T. [Incorrect Event (Notice of)]
    Date Published:October 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hatcher, Michele T. [Notice of Dismissal/Withdrawal of a Document]
    Date Published:October 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hatcher, Michele T. [Notice of Continuing Default]
    Date Published:July 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Limit Notice]
    Date Published:March 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Order (Generic-from hearing)]
    Date Published:February 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:May 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Modification of Plan (All Chapters)]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Notice of Hearing - Van002]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Answer]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Order (Blank)]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Modify Plan]
    Date Published:February 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Final Hearing Set]
    Date Published:January 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:January 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Fact Summary for Motion for Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:January 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:January 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Incorrect Claim (Notice of)]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Withdrawal of Claim]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Objection to Claim(s)]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Debtor Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:September 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Hearing Scheduled]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Notice to Individual Consumer Debtor (Fm B201)]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income Form 22C-1]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income Form 22C-2]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Statement of Information Required by 11 USC Section 341]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Statement of Attorney for Debtor in a Chapter 13]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Summary of Schedules]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Schedules A-J]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ford, Michael [Notice of Deficient Filing]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.alnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?619656
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =