open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:1:17-cv-00094
    Party Name:Coates v. City of Jackson, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:May 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:May 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:April 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:April 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:April 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Exhibits]
    Date Published:March 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief]
    Date Published:March 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:March 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:March 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Position Regarding Settlement]
    Date Published:March 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:March 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:December 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Mediation]
    Date Published:August 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:August 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing]
    Date Published:August 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motions Referred]
    Date Published:August 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mediation]
    Date Published:August 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Discovery]
    Date Published:July 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:July 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:May 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:May 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - Document NOTED]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Document Referred]
    Date Published:May 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:May 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:April 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:March 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Proposed Summons]
    Date Published:March 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:March 01, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?60719
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =