open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama

ALABAMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:19-00042-
    Party Name:Watson v. The Water Works Board of the City of Birmingham
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:July 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Incorrect Event (Notice of)]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.alnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?674272
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =