open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:19-81768-13
    Party Name:Danny R Southard
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hatcher, Michele T. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hatcher, Michele T. [Approving]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hatcher, Michele T. [Notice of Withdrawal]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hatcher, Michele T. [Amended Schedules (Fee)]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hatcher, Michele T. [Notice of Hearing - Van002]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hatcher, Michele T. [Dismiss Case - Other]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hatcher, Michele T. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hatcher, Michele T. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hatcher, Michele T. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hatcher, Michele T. [Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assign)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hatcher, Michele T. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Non-Image Order)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hatcher, Michele T. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hatcher, Michele T. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.alnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?674497
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =