open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:19-02349-13
    Party Name:Jerrell Marshun Hughes
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Withdrawal]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Notice of Hearing - Van002]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Dismiss Case - Other]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Trustee Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Payment of Fee (Full Filing Fee, Installment Payment, Reopen)]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Trustee Direction for Deduction]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assign)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Non-Image Order)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.alnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?674499
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =