open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00275
    Party Name:Weatherby v. The Terminix International Company, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Document Referred]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motions Referred]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand to State Court]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer due deadline]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement Mailed]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?64797
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =