open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

ALABAMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00523
    Party Name:Radcliff v. Danby Products, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Document Referred]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - Document NOTED]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?65252
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =