open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

ALABAMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00631
    Party Name:The Municipality of Troy v. Wilke (MAG+)
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Deadline]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consolidate Cases]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.almd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?70703
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =