open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

ALABAMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama
    Case Number:2:18-cv-00730
    Party Name:Davis v. ElectriCom, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Show Cause]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.almd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?67545
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =