open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

ALABAMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00855
    Party Name:Barnett v. Jones et al (INMATE 2)
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.almd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?71316
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =