open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

ALABAMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00234-1
    Party Name:USA v. Aguilar, et.al.
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:May 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:May 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:May 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Voir Dire]
    Date Published:May 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest - Other District]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Joinder]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motions Referred]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference re: Guidelines]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Arraignment]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment ]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?65434
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =