open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

ALABAMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama
    Case Number:2:20-cv-00100
    Party Name:Denmark v. Elmore County Sheriff Department (MAG+)
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.almd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?72111
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =