open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

ALABAMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama
    Case Number:1:20-cr-00041-1
    Party Name:USA v. Pytleski
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Trial]
    Date Published:July 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:May 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Arraignment]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Detention]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.almd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?72107
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =