open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

ALABAMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00092
    Party Name:Lowe v. Municipal Court of Dothan Alabama et al (MAG+)
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:September 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing]
    Date Published:July 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.almd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?72058
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =