U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Southall
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • April 22, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 16, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Detain]
  • March 23, 2021: [Document Referred]
  • March 22, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 18, 2021: [Pretrial Memorandum ]
  • March 16, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • March 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Preliminary Examination]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 10, 2021: [Detain]
  • March 08, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 02, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 01, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.