U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00003
  • Case Name: Pugh v. Selene Finance LP
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order - Document NOTED]
  • October 11, 2022: [Document Referred]
  • October 07, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Order]
  • March 04, 2021: [~Util - Set Motion Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.