U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mc-03936
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Murphy-Thomas et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 08, 2021: [Seal]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • August 10, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 10, 2021: [Quash]
  • August 05, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 03, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Hearing]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order to Show Cause]
  • July 15, 2021: [Stay]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • July 13, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • July 13, 2021: [Seal]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Order to Show Cause]
  • June 09, 2021: [Quash]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Order]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order to Show Cause]
  • May 25, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 12, 2021: [Hearing]
  • April 12, 2021: [Stay]
  • April 12, 2021: [Hearing]
  • April 12, 2021: [Stay]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Writ of Garnishment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.