U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00184-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Haskew
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Remark]
  • December 22, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 08, 2022: [Continue-Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Document Referred]
  • November 22, 2022: [Remark]
  • November 16, 2022: [Status Conference re: Guidelines]
  • November 04, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order for Repayment of CJA Attorney Fees]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Arraignment]
  • November 03, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Federal Defender]
  • November 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 03, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 03, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 02, 2022: [Detain]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.