U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00293-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cole
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2023
  • August 15, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 09, 2023: [Withdraw Document]
  • August 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal]
July, 2023
  • July 24, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 20, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2023
  • April 05, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 05, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 05, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2023
  • March 27, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • March 16, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • November 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 14, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • November 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Arraignment]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2022: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 02, 2022: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • November 01, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.