U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00228-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Massey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 06, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • December 06, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order and Writ on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 28, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.