U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00291-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LIKELY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2023
  • July 24, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 18, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • July 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 18, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • July 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • July 11, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • July 07, 2023: [Variance]
May, 2023
  • May 17, 2023: [Process Receipt and Return]
March, 2023
  • March 30, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 29, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 29, 2023: [Order]
  • March 29, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 28, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
February, 2023
  • February 16, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Arraignment]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 07, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 07, 2022: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • December 06, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.