U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00370-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HOWELL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 18, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 17, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 10, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2023
  • December 27, 2023: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 13, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • December 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 13, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • December 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • December 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • December 13, 2023: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
August, 2023
  • August 15, 2023: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 07, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 07, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2023
  • March 27, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 27, 2023: [Order]
  • March 27, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 27, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 06, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 06, 2023: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Arraignment]
  • December 13, 2022: [Oral Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.