U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00369-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BROOKS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2023
  • October 06, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 06, 2023: [Judgment]
  • October 06, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • October 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 06, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • October 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • October 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • October 06, 2023: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
September, 2023
  • September 11, 2023: [Order]
  • September 11, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 11, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2023: [Detention]
June, 2023
  • June 28, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 28, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 21, 2023: [Order]
  • June 21, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2023
  • May 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • May 11, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
March, 2023
  • March 29, 2023: [Order]
  • March 29, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 23, 2023: [Continue Trial]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.